THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:33:06 AM
Paul, Narinder Singh
CPSO#:
70232
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Southampton, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chair-Chief Medical Imaging
LHSC University Hospital
Rm C2-226
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A6
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARINDER SINGH PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2000 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2004 |