THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:41:43 AM
Camazzola, Daniele Carlo
CPSO#:
70212
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3Y1
Phone: (905) 883-4443
Fax: (905) 883-4477
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELE CARLO CAMAZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMAZZOLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |