THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:14:44 AM
Hutchings, Leslie-Anne
CPSO#:
70203
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Phone: 905-523-1616
Fax: 905-523-6114
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLIE-ANNE HUTCHINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINGS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1998 |