THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:42:40 PM
Hunt, Carolyn Pasifull Iliffe
CPSO#:
70200
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Iliffe, Carolyn Pasifull (used until: 19 Jul 2000 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Children's Centre
600 Townline Road South
Oshawa ON L1H 7K6
Phone: (905) 728-1673
Fax: (905) 728-2961
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLYN PASIFULL ILIFFE HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2000 |