THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:41:11 AM
Sadik, Zaki Kamel
CPSO#:
70169
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Asyut University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-9425 Leslie St
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N7
Phone: 9052376189
Fax: 9057374773
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Mar 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZAKI KAMEL SADIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 1999 |