THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:44:33 AM
Toft, Ian Peter
CPSO#:
70138
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
990 Gainsborough Road
Thompson Medical Centre
London ON N6H 5L4
Phone: (519) 601-8621 Ext. 101
Fax: (519) 204-3122
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN PETER TOFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOFT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1999 |