THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:50:34 PM
Dimitrakoudis, Dimitrios Peter
CPSO#:
70112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
suite 4S-406
Sunnyside building
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 604-9500
Fax: (416) 604-1560
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:05 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS PETER DIMITRAKOUDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMITRAKOUDIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2002 |