THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:42:11 PM
Prebtani, Ally-Kareem Pyarali Habib
CPSO#:
70107
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
McMaster University
237 Barton Street RM 411
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44599
Fax: (905) 577-1418
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:05 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLY-KAREEM PYARALI HABIB PREBTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREBTANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 08 Feb 2009 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Sep 2005
Summary:
On September 29, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prebtani committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that the Registrar suspend Dr. Prebtani(s certificate of registration for three (3) months, commencing thirty (30) days after the date of this order, two (2) months of which suspension shall be suspended provided that Dr. Prebtani successfully completes, at his own expense, a College-approved Boundaries Course and a College-approved Anger Management Course and provides proof thereof to the College.
Dr. Prebtani appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court on October 19, 2005, which stayed the decision of the Discipline Committee pending the outcome of the appeal. On December 8, 2008, Dr. Prebtani discontinued his appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2008-12-08
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 2005