THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:12:43 AM
Yazdani, Shahin
CPSO#:
70105
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
queensway carleton hospital
3045 baseline road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHIN YAZDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1997 to 30 Apr 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1999 |