THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:19:06 PM
Rathee, Rajinder Singh
CPSO#:
70079
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Farsi, French, Gujarati, Hindi, Italian, Mandarin, Panjabi/Punjabi, Tamil, Urdu
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18 Wynford Drive, Suite 108
North York ON M3C 3S2
Phone: 416-494-7455
Fax: 416-494-4833
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJINDER SINGH RATHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |