THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:02:40 PM
Phan, Nicolas
CPSO#:
70058
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Phan Cong, Nicolas (used until: 29 Jun 2006 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Phan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - West Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:28 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |