THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:21:09 AM
Didyk, Nicole Elaine
CPSO#:
70028
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 519-621-2333
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLE ELAINE DIDYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIDYK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2004 |