THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:41:08 AM
Corey, JoAnn Marie
CPSO#:
70025
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3570 King St E
Grand River Hospital, Freeport Site
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Phone: 519-749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANN MARIE COREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COREY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2002 |