THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:47:16 PM
Etemad-Rezai, Roya
CPSO#:
70024
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French, German
Education: Queen's University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
LHSC - University Hospital
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32894
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROYA ETEMAD-REZAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMAD-REZAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2000 to 30 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2004 |