THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:08:20 AM
Hogan, Jeffrey Gerard
CPSO#:
69981
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Quarry Medical
2300 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G4
Phone: (613) 541-3922
Fax: (613) 541-0744
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jan 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY GERARD HOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2000 |