THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:26:06 AM
Gladdy, Rebecca Anne
CPSO#:
69953
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 6-445.10
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165864800 Ext. 3812
Fax: 4165868392
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE GLADDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2005 |