THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:26:44 PM
MacLeod, Bryan Robert Angus
CPSO#:
69944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: MacLeod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRYAN ROBERT ANGUS MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1998 |