THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:41:03 AM
Sim, Franklin Hindson
CPSO#:
69931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Phone: 613 541 5010 Ext. 6994
Fax: 613 541 6891
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN HINDSON SIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |