THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:18:34 PM
Blumer, Russell David
CPSO#:
69919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUSSELL DAVID BLUMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2002 |