THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:33:40 AM
Hui, Charles Pok Sum
CPSO#:
69901
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Infectious Disease
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2651
Fax: (613) 738-4832
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. Hui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:05 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES POK SUM HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2000 |