THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:49:47 AM
Leger-Nolet, Celine Nicole
CPSO#:
69894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-1088 Ext. 2434
Fax: (705) 647-1065
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Englehart and District Hospital |
Englehart |
Espanola General Hospital |
Espanola |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Jan 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CELINE NICOLE LEGER-NOLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGER-NOLET is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 20 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 19 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Jan 2001 to 31 May 2001
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2001 |