THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:25:21 PM
Pham, Cuong Duc
CPSO#:
69868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2001 Avenue Victoria, suite 108
St-Lambert QC J4S 1H1
Phone: (450) 465-9927
Fax: (450) 465-1781
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CUONG DUC PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
EL - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1997 |