THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:54:23 AM
Shehata, Nadine
CPSO#:
69867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 11-311
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2296
Fax: (416) 586-8481
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:09 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADINE SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
EL - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1998 |