THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:13:43 AM
Ghally, Gehan Rafaat
CPSO#:
69864
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON N2N 2A8
Phone: (519) 578-5555
Fax: (519) 578-5551
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEHAN RAFAAT GHALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Mar 1996 to 24 Jul 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jul 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2000 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 4, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: Effective August 28, 2020 Dr. Ghally has completed the elements of his SCERP
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)