THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:48:13 AM
Oechslin, Erwin Notker
CPSO#:
69857
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
06 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Italian
Education: University of Zurich, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
UHN-Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Adult Congenital Heart Dise
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: +14163403338
Fax: +14163405014
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Feb 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:24 Feb 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERWIN NOTKER OECHSLIN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. OECHSLIN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. OECHSLIN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. OECHSLIN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. OECHSLIN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. OECHSLIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1996 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 May 1996 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 10 Sep 2009 |