THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:38:20 PM
Nwadiaro, Nduka Francis
CPSO#:
69839
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Mar 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Mar 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Igbo
Education: University of Nigeria, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3-2545 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1L9
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NDUKA FRANCIS NWADIARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWADIARO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 May 1996 to 31 May 1996
EL - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2003 |