THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:10:21 PM
Milio, Hany Shawky
CPSO#:
69836
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Westheights Drive
Suite 201
Kitchener ON N2N 2A8
Phone: (519) 578-5555
Fax: (519) 578-5551
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANY SHAWKY MILIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILIO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1999 |