THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:57:36 PM
Devereaux, Philip James
CPSO#:
69774
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Mar 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Mar 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Population Health Research Inst
David Braley Cardiac Vascular and
Stroke Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40654
Fax: (905) 297-3778
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP JAMES DEVEREAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVEREAUX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 12 Feb 1996 to 10 Mar 1996
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Mar 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2000 |