THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:23:35 PM
Almadani, Mahmud Husin Mohamad
CPSO#:
69773
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Apr 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
204-95 Bayly St W
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: 9056865790
Fax: 9056866788
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:04 Feb 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHMUD HUSIN MOHAMAD ALMADANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMADANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 27 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 28 Dec 1998 to 08 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2002 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Oct 2006 |