THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:32:45 AM
Green, Kevin Wayne
CPSO#:
69739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Dec 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
601-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: 905-848-5599
Fax: 905-848-8606
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN WAYNE GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 1996 to 11 Feb 1996
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 1998 |