THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:38:10 PM
Druzin, Paul Allan
CPSO#:
69699
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON M2M 2G1
Phone: 416 226 6789
Fax: 416 226 4431
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL ALLAN DRUZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUZIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Nov 1995 to 17 Dec 1995
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1996 |