THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:36:03 PM
Edmonds, Marcia Lynn
CPSO#:
69693
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Oct 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Oct 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCIA LYNN EDMONDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDMONDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Nov 1995 to 17 Dec 1995
EL - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Apr 1996 to 05 May 1996
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2004 |