THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:15:40 AM
Habib, Emad Ayyad
CPSO#:
69682
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Habib Kellada, Emad Ayyad (used until: 29 Jul 2002 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Asyut University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2150 Robertson Rd
Nepean ON K2H 9S1
Phone: 613-482-0118
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Emad Habib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMAD AYYAD HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2002 |