THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:49:11 PM
O'Blenes, Stacy Brian
CPSO#:
69651
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 836-4600
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STACY BRIAN O'BLENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BLENES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Sep 1995 to 02 Jan 1996
EL - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jan 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2015 |