THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:46:14 AM
Hassan, Ali Nabeel
CPSO#:
69649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON N3R 7K8
Phone: (519) 756-2512
Fax: (519) 756-3125
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ali Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 1995 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 11 Jun 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 30 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 11 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Jun 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 23 Jun 2015 |
|
Active |