THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:44:32 PM
Michael, George Phillip
CPSO#:
69627
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Yonge Davis Centre
C 2 B
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 8A7
Phone: (905) 898-3700
Fax: (905) 898-3738
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. George P. Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 15 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE PHILLIP MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 06 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2000 |