THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:33:04 AM
Pervez, Yasmin
CPSO#:
69612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Health Centre
3420, Hurantario street
Mississauga ON L5B 4A9
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: 905 272-4082
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Feb 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2015 |
|
Active |