THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:29:54 AM
Findlay, Sheri Michelle
CPSO#:
69573
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Department of Paediatrics
H.S.C. - 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75658
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERI MICHELLE FINDLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINDLAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1997 |