THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:08:33 PM
Welch, Robert James
CPSO#:
69571
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Dec 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert Welch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Dr. Ellyn Braun at the Peterborough Medical Centre for medical record inquiries.
Peterborough Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough, ON K9J 7B3
Date Received: 12 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1995 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |