THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:35:14 AM
Makar, Magdy Samir Isaac
CPSO#:
69540
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
01 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
1-Apr-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Magdy S. Makar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who wish to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a written request to: [email protected].
Date Received: 11 Apr 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
CF - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Nov 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 1998 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 01 Apr 2018 |