THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:57:37 PM
Gelman, Marc Loren
CPSO#:
69528
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hosp General Div
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8200
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dubo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:10 Jan 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
|
Active |