THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:34:02 AM
Kebede, Daniel
CPSO#:
69494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, Bulgarian, English
Education: Medical Academy Sofia, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 272-3131
Fax: (905) 272-8284
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL KEBEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEBEDE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1997 |