THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:19:56 PM
Gerstle, Justin Theodore
CPSO#:
69476
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dartmouth Medical School, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J.T. Gerstle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hospital for Sick Children
Roy Hill Wing, Rm 1526
555 University Ave
Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 08 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:03 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Pediatric Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2018 |