THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:25:36 PM
Patel, Paulum Upendra
CPSO#:
69465
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Mar 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 May 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Deveron Medical Clinic
1166 Commissioners Rd E
Unit 7
London ON N5Z 4W8
Electoral District: 02
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who saw Dr Patel at Highbury Medical Walk-In Clinic may call
(519) 521-5000 or email: [email protected]
Date Received: 05 May 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAULUM UPENDRA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 1, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)