THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:59:12 PM
Hollohan, Kirk Gerard
CPSO#:
69463
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
302-1886 Oxford St W
London ON N6K 0J8
Phone: 5198581633
Fax: 5192861626
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Brown & Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 25 2021
Corporation Name: Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRK GERARD HOLLOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2007 |