THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:40:55 PM
Hannam, Thomas Gordon
CPSO#:
69460
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hannam Fertility Centre
15Th Floor
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON M4W 3R2
Phone: (416) 595-1521
Fax: (416) 506-0680
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS GORDON HANNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 04 Sep 2000 to 29 Sep 2000
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Sep 2002
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2001 |