THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:45:21 PM
Krishnar, Kannan
CPSO#:
69441
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
540 - 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 827-9865
Fax: (905) 827-3583
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KANNAN KRISHNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1997 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: March 5, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Kannan Krishnar was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: March 5, 2020
SENTENCE: 15 months driving prohibition; Fine of $2000; 12 months probation