THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:04:40 PM
Skory, Leah Michaelle
CPSO#:
69408
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Barrie Community Health Centre
Eagle Ridge Professional Complex
490 Huronia Road
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 734-9690
Fax: (705) 734-0239
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEAH MICHAELLE SKORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKORY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1998 |