THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:15:04 PM
Welsford, Michelle
CPSO#:
69388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services |
Owen Sound |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE WELSFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |