THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:35:17 PM
Lakhanpal, Pulkesh
CPSO#:
69360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 531-2266
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PULKESH LAKHANPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANPAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2006 |